+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/22/18 Session Law Chapter 227 Effective: 07/01/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 4:35 p.m. on 03/20/18
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 69
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor