+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 02/19/14
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor on 02/17/14
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 68-0-2
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Revenue & Taxation
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 34-0-1
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
LOCAL GOVERNMENT AND TAXATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor