+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 23-12-0AYES – Bair, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Davis, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Rice, Schmidt, Stennett, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – Anthon, Bayer, Den Hartog, Harris, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Siddoway, Souza, Thayn, VickAbsent and excused – NoneFloor Sponsor - LodgeTitle apvd - to House
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor