+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full as amended – PASSED - 35-0-0
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
- Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
- Amendments reported printed
- Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
- Reported out without recommendation, as amended
- Placed in the Committee of the Whole
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Transportation
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Vote
March 11, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor