+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 02/11/20 Session Law Chapter 6 Effective: 07/01/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 1:38 p.m. on 02/10/20
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 70-0-0
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 35-0-0
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 70
January 20, 2020: upper Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor