+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 02/25/16 Session Law Chapter 26 Effective: 07/01/2016
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on 02/19/16
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 68-1-1AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen(Hartgen), Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Smith, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – SimsAbsent – ThompsonFloor Sponsor - BatemanTitle apvd - to Senate
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 31-0-4AYES – Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – Davis, McKenzie, Nonini, SchmidtFloor Sponsor - HagedornTitle apvd - to House
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor