+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/11/14
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor on 03/06/14
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 51-15-4
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Business
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 30-4-1
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
COMMERCE AND HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor