+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 04/06/17 Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 07/01/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 2 p.m. on 03/30/17
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 2 Abs/Excd 3, read three times – PASSED - 59-8-3AYES – Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Armstrong, Bell, Blanksma, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Giddings, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan(Ringo), Kauffman, King, Kingsley, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Manwaring, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Scott, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Syme, Thompson, Toone, VanOrden, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Zito, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Barbieri, Hanks, Moon, Nate, Troy, Trujillo, Vander Woude, ZollingerAbsent – Gibbs, Harris, KerbyFloor Sponsor - KingTitle apvd - to Senate
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) – Read third time in full – PASSED - 31-2-2AYES – Agenbroad, Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Crabtree, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Jordan, Keough, Lakey, Lee, Martin, Mortimer, Nye, Patrick, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – Foreman, NoniniAbsent and excused – Johnson, LodgeFloor Sponsor - SouzaTitle apvd - to House
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor