+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on 03/28/19
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/28/19 Session Law Chapter 250 Effective: 07/01/2019
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2019: upper Vote
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 67
- Absent: 3
March 18, 2019: upper Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor