+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 04/06/17 Session Law Chapter 290 Effective: 07/01/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 2 p.m. on 03/30/17
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 64-3-3AYES – Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Barbieri, Bell, Blanksma, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Giddings, Hanks, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan(Ringo), Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kingsley, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Manwaring, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moon, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Rubel, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Syme, Thompson, Toone, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Zito, Zollinger, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Armstrong, Nate, ScottAbsent – DeMordaunt, Moyle, RedmanFloor Sponsor - MillerTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 32-1-2AYES – Agenbroad, Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Crabtree, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nye, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – ForemanAbsent and excused – Patrick, StennettFloor Sponsor - LeeTitle apvd - to House
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor