+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective: 07/01/2015
- Session Law Chapter 319
- Signed by Governor on 04/10/15
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor on 04/09/15
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times - PASSED - 65-4-1
- Title apvd - to Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to House
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) - PASSED - 35-0-0
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor