+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 05/06/21 Session Law Chapter 308 Effective: 07/01/2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 12:52 p.m. on 05/04/21
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – Previously Read in Full – PASSED - 41-28-1
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 26, 2021
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 19, 2021
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 12, 2021
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 30-5-0
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2021: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Nay
- Judy Boyle: Nay
- Lance Clow: Yea
- Brent J. Crane: Nay
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Nay
- Marc Gibbs: Yea
- James Holtzclaw: Nay
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Nay
- Jason A. Monks: Yea
- Mike Moyle: Yea
- John Vander Woude: Yea
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Yea
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ryan Kerby: Yea
- John McCrostie: Yea
- Ilana Rubel: Yea
- Heather Scott: Nay
- Sage G. Dixon: Nay
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Yea
- Randy Armstrong: Nay
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Yea
- Priscilla Giddings: Nay
- Karey Hanks: Nay
- Mike Kingsley: Nay
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Nay
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Nay
- Kevin Andrus: Nay
- Steve Berch: Yea
- Chad Christensen: Nay
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Laurie Lickley: Yea
- Tammy Nichols: Nay
- Tony Wisniewski: Nay
- Julianne Young: Yea
- Rod Furniss: Yea
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Jim Addis: Yea
- Aaron von Ehlinger: Nay
- Ben Adams: Nay
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Yea
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Absent
- Greg Ferch: Nay
- Codi Galloway: Nay
- Steven C. Harris: Nay
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Yea
- Ron Nate: Nay
- Doug Okuniewicz: Nay
- Joe A. Palmer: Nay
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Nay
- Bruce D. Skaug: Nay
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Yea
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
March 15, 2021: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 5
Details:
+
−
- Grant Burgoyne: Yea
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Yea
- Steve Bair: Yea
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Lee Heider: Yea
- Todd M. Lakey: Yea
- Patti Anne Lodge: Yea
- Fred S. Martin: Yea
- Jim Rice: Nay
- Michelle Stennett: Yea
- Steven P. Thayn: Nay
- Steve Vick: Nay
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Mark Nye: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Yea
- Lori Den Hartog: Yea
- Abby Lee: Yea
- Mary Souza: Yea
- Van T. Burtenshaw: Yea
- Mark Harris: Yea
- Jeff Agenbroad: Yea
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Yea
- Carl Crabtree: Yea
- Jim L. Patrick: Yea
- Christy Zito: Nay
- C. Scott Grow: Yea
- Doug Ricks: Yea
- Dave Lent: Yea
- David Nelson: Yea
- Jim Woodward: Yea
- Regina M. Bayer: Nay
- Daniel G. Johnson: Yea
- Kevin Cook: Yea
- Ali Rabe: Yea
- Peter Riggs: Yea
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor