+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 04/22/21 Session Law Chapter 275 Effective: 07/01/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 3 p.m. on 04/21/21
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
- Title apvd - to Senate
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – Previously Read in Full – PASSED - 64-3-3
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 19, 2021
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
- Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full as amended – PASSED - 28-7-0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
- Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
- Amendments reported printed
- Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
- Reported out without recommendation, as amended
- Placed in the Committee of the Whole
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2021: House Vote
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Yea
- Judy Boyle: Yea
- Lance Clow: Yea
- Brent J. Crane: Yea
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Yea
- Marc Gibbs: Absent
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Yea
- Jason A. Monks: Yea
- Mike Moyle: Yea
- John Vander Woude: Yea
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Yea
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ryan Kerby: Yea
- John McCrostie: Nay
- Ilana Rubel: Nay
- Heather Scott: Yea
- Sage G. Dixon: Yea
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Yea
- Randy Armstrong: Yea
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Yea
- Priscilla Giddings: Yea
- Karey Hanks: Yea
- Mike Kingsley: Yea
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Yea
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Yea
- Kevin Andrus: Yea
- Steve Berch: Yea
- Chad Christensen: Yea
- Brooke Green: Yea
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Laurie Lickley: Yea
- Tammy Nichols: Yea
- Tony Wisniewski: Yea
- Julianne Young: Yea
- Rod Furniss: Absent
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Jim Addis: Yea
- Aaron von Ehlinger: Yea
- Ben Adams: Yea
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Yea
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Yea
- Greg Ferch: Yea
- Codi Galloway: Yea
- Steven C. Harris: Yea
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Nay
- Ron Nate: Yea
- Doug Okuniewicz: Yea
- Joe A. Palmer: Yea
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Yea
- Bruce D. Skaug: Yea
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Yea
- Julie Yamamoto: Absent
March 18, 2021: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
Details:
+
−
- Grant Burgoyne: Nay
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Nay
- Steve Bair: Yea
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Lee Heider: Yea
- Todd M. Lakey: Yea
- Patti Anne Lodge: Yea
- Fred S. Martin: Nay
- Jim Rice: Yea
- Michelle Stennett: Nay
- Steven P. Thayn: Yea
- Steve Vick: Yea
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Mark Nye: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Nay
- Lori Den Hartog: Yea
- Abby Lee: Yea
- Mary Souza: Yea
- Van T. Burtenshaw: Yea
- Mark Harris: Yea
- Jeff Agenbroad: Yea
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Yea
- Carl Crabtree: Yea
- Jim L. Patrick: Yea
- Christy Zito: Yea
- C. Scott Grow: Yea
- Doug Ricks: Yea
- Dave Lent: Yea
- David Nelson: Nay
- Jim Woodward: Yea
- Regina M. Bayer: Yea
- Daniel G. Johnson: Yea
- Kevin Cook: Yea
- Ali Rabe: Nay
- Peter Riggs: Yea
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor