+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/29/13
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor on 03/27/13
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 44-20-6
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 29-5-1
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor