+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective: 07/01/2015
- Session Law Chapter 133
- Signed by Governor on 03/26/15
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor on 03/23/15
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 58-11-1
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to House
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 34-0-1
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Finance
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor