+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
- Order ret’d to Senate
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – Previously Read in Full – FAILED - 14-54-2
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 15, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 34-0-1
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Agricultural Affairs
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2021: House Vote
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Nay
- Judy Boyle: Nay
- Brent J. Crane: Nay
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Nay
- Marc Gibbs: Nay
- James Holtzclaw: Nay
- Wendy Horman: Nay
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Nay
- Jason A. Monks: Absent
- Mike Moyle: Yea
- John Vander Woude: Yea
- Fred Wood: Nay
- Rick D. Youngblood: Nay
- Greg Chaney: Nay
- Sue Chew: Nay
- Ryan Kerby: Absent
- John McCrostie: Nay
- Ilana Rubel: Yea
- Heather Scott: Nay
- Sage G. Dixon: Yea
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Nay
- Paul Amador: Nay
- Randy Armstrong: Nay
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Nay
- Priscilla Giddings: Nay
- Karey Hanks: Nay
- Mike Kingsley: Nay
- Dustin Manwaring: Nay
- Dorothy Moon: Nay
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Nay
- Kevin Andrus: Nay
- Steve Berch: Nay
- Chad Christensen: Nay
- Muffy Davis: Nay
- Brooke Green: Nay
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Nay
- Laurie Lickley: Nay
- Tammy Nichols: Nay
- Tony Wisniewski: Nay
- Julianne Young: Nay
- Rod Furniss: Nay
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Jim Addis: Nay
- Aaron von Ehlinger: Nay
- Ben Adams: Nay
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Yea
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Nay
- Greg Ferch: Yea
- Codi Galloway: Nay
- Steven C. Harris: Nay
- Gary L. Marshall: Nay
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Nay
- Colin Nash: Nay
- Ron Nate: Nay
- Doug Okuniewicz: Nay
- Joe A. Palmer: Nay
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Nay
- Sally J. Toone: Nay
- Jon O. Weber: Nay
- Julie Yamamoto: Nay
March 1, 2021: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Grant Burgoyne: Yea
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Yea
- Steve Bair: Absent
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Lee Heider: Yea
- Todd M. Lakey: Yea
- Patti Anne Lodge: Yea
- Fred S. Martin: Yea
- Jim Rice: Yea
- Michelle Stennett: Yea
- Steven P. Thayn: Yea
- Steve Vick: Yea
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Mark Nye: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Yea
- Lori Den Hartog: Yea
- Abby Lee: Yea
- Mary Souza: Yea
- Van T. Burtenshaw: Yea
- Mark Harris: Yea
- Jeff Agenbroad: Yea
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Yea
- Carl Crabtree: Yea
- Jim L. Patrick: Yea
- Christy Zito: Yea
- C. Scott Grow: Yea
- Doug Ricks: Yea
- Dave Lent: Yea
- David Nelson: Yea
- Jim Woodward: Yea
- Regina M. Bayer: Yea
- Daniel G. Johnson: Yea
- Kevin Cook: Yea
- Ali Rabe: Yea
- Peter Riggs: Yea
+ − Sponsor
RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor