+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 04/01/13
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor on 03/27/13
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 67-0-3
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 25, 2013
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 35-0-0
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsors (3)
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor