+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/28/19 Session Law Chapter 244 Effective: 07/01/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Reported delivered to Governor at 1:30 p.m. on 03/27/19
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported out without recommendation, as amended
- Placed in the Committee of the Whole
- Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
- Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
- Amendments reported printed
- Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to 14th Order for amendment
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Retained on calendar
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2019: upper Vote
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 66
- Absent: 4
March 12, 2019: upper Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor