+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 05/10/21 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/2021
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 11:30 a.m. on 05/06/21
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
- Title apvd - to Senate
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 52 Nays 6 Abs/Excd 11, read in full as required – PASSED - 58-0-11
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 34-0-1
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2021: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Grant Burgoyne: Yea
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Absent
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Lee Heider: Yea
- Todd M. Lakey: Yea
- Patti Anne Lodge: Yea
- Fred S. Martin: Yea
- Jim Rice: Yea
- Michelle Stennett: Yea
- Steven P. Thayn: Yea
- Steve Vick: Yea
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Mark Nye: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Yea
- Lori Den Hartog: Yea
- Abby Lee: Yea
- Mary Souza: Yea
- Mark Harris: Yea
- Jeff Agenbroad: Yea
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Yea
- Carl Crabtree: Yea
- Jim L. Patrick: Yea
- Christy Zito: Yea
- C. Scott Grow: Yea
- Doug Ricks: Yea
- Dave Lent: Yea
- David Nelson: Yea
- Jim Woodward: Yea
- Regina M. Bayer: Yea
- Daniel G. Johnson: Yea
- Kevin Cook: Yea
- Ali Rabe: Yea
- Peter Riggs: Yea
February 19, 2021: House Vote
- Yeas: 58
- Absent: 11
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Yea
- Judy Boyle: Yea
- Lance Clow: Absent
- Brent J. Crane: Yea
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Absent
- Marc Gibbs: Absent
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Absent
- Ron Mendive: Yea
- Jason A. Monks: Yea
- Mike Moyle: Yea
- John Vander Woude: Yea
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Yea
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ryan Kerby: Yea
- John McCrostie: Yea
- Ilana Rubel: Yea
- Heather Scott: Yea
- Sage G. Dixon: Yea
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Yea
- Randy Armstrong: Absent
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Yea
- Priscilla Giddings: Yea
- Karey Hanks: Yea
- Mike Kingsley: Yea
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Yea
- Scott Syme: Absent
- Barbara Ehardt: Yea
- Kevin Andrus: Absent
- Steve Berch: Yea
- Chad Christensen: Yea
- Muffy Davis: Yea
- Brooke Green: Yea
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Absent
- Laurie Lickley: Absent
- Tammy Nichols: Yea
- Tony Wisniewski: Yea
- Julianne Young: Yea
- Rod Furniss: Yea
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Ben Adams: Yea
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Yea
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Yea
- Greg Ferch: Yea
- Codi Galloway: Yea
- Steven C. Harris: Yea
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Yea
- Ron Nate: Yea
- Doug Okuniewicz: Yea
- Joe A. Palmer: Yea
- James D. Ruchti: Absent
- Charlie Shepherd: Yea
- Bruce D. Skaug: Yea
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Absent
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor