+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/08/13
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor on 03/05/13
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 68-0-2
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 33-0-2
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Transportation
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor