+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 02/27/23 Session Law Chapter 10 Effective: 07/01/2023
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 11:18 a.m. on 02/24/23
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 64-5-1
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 31-3-1
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2023: House Vote
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Yea
- Judy Boyle: Yea
- John Gannon: Yea
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Yea
- Jason A. Monks: Yea
- John Vander Woude: Yea
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ilana Rubel: Yea
- Heather Scott: Yea
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Lance W. Clow: Yea
- Mike Kingsley: Yea
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Yea
- Kevin Andrus: Yea
- Steve Berch: Nay
- Brooke Green: Yea
- Britt Raybould: Yea
- Jerald Raymond: Yea
- Tony Wisniewski: Yea
- Julianne Young: Yea
- Rod Furniss: Yea
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Yea
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Nay
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Nay
- Joe A. Palmer: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Yea
- Bruce D. Skaug: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Yea
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
- Lori McCann: Yea
- Ned Burns: Nay
- Joe Alfieri: Yea
- Christopher M. “Chris” Allgood: Absent
- Richard W. “Rick” Cheatum: Yea
- Jeff J. Cornilles: Yea
- Melissa Durrant: Yea
- Jeff Ehlers: Yea
- Marco Adam Erickson: Yea
- Soñia R. Galaviz: Nay
- Jacyn Gallagher: Yea
- Dan Garner: Yea
- Clay Handy: Yea
- Dale R. Hawkins: Yea
- Dori Healey: Yea
- Edward H. “Ted” Hill: Yea
- Tina Lambert: Yea
- Greg L. Lanting: Yea
- Stephanie Jo Mickelsen: Yea
- Steve Miller: Yea
- Jack Nelsen: Yea
- James Petzke: Yea
- Douglas T. Pickett: Yea
- Elaine Price: Yea
- Jordan Redman: Yea
- Nate Roberts: Yea
- Mark Sauter: Yea
- Josh Tanner: Yea
- Josh Wheeler: Yea
- Kenny Wroten: Yea
February 13, 2023: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Julie VanOrden: Yea
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Yea
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Todd M. Lakey: Yea
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Nay
- Lori Den Hartog: Yea
- Abby Lee: Yea
- Van T. Burtenshaw: Yea
- Mark Harris: Yea
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Yea
- C. Scott Grow: Yea
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Tammy Nichols: Yea
- Doug Ricks: Yea
- Dave Lent: Absent
- Ben Adams: Yea
- Doug Okuniewicz: Yea
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Kevin Cook: Yea
- Carrie Semmelroth: Nay
- Treg A. Bernt: Yea
- Carl J. Bjerke: Yea
- Cindy J. Carlson: Yea
- Daniel D. Foreman: Yea
- Phil Hart: Yea
- Scott Herndon: Yea
- James R. “Rick” Just: Yea
- Brian Lenney: Yea
- Alison “Ali” Rabe: Yea
- Geoff Schroeder: Yea
- Ron C. Taylor: Nay
- Ben Toews: Yea
- Chris T. Trakel: Yea
- Glenneda Zuiderveld: Yea
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor