+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective: 07/01/2015
- Session Law Chapter 112
- Signed by Governor on 03/25/15
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor on 03/19/15
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 64-0-6
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to House
- [District 17 seat temporarily vacant]
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 34-0-0
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY AND RULES COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor