+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/21/19 Session Law Chapter 144 Effective: 07/01/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 2:05 p.m. on 03/20/19
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
- U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Business
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 14, 2019: upper Vote
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 68
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2019: upper Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor