+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor on 03/20/17 Session Law Chapter 87 Effective: 07/01/2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported delivered to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on 03/16/17
- Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
- Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 70-0-0AYES – Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Armstrong, Barbieri, Bell, Blanksma, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Giddings, Hanks, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kingsley, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Manwaring, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moon, Moyle, Nate, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Scott, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Syme, Thompson, Toone, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Zito, Zollinger, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – NoneAbsent – NoneFloor Sponsor - McCrostieTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
- Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 34-0-1AYES – Agenbroad, Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Burgoyne, Crabtree, Davis, Den Hartog, Foreman, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nye, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Siddoway, Smith(Rice), Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – PatrickFloor Sponsor - AgenbroadTitle apvd - to House
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor