+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Education
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – ADOPTED - 66-4-0AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek(Chadderdon), McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Chew, Erpelding, Rusche, WintrowAbsent and excused – NoneFloor Sponsor - BatemanTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 7, 2016
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
EDUCATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor