+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:50 a.m. on March 16, 2018
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read in full – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – BayerTitle apvd – to House
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Retained on calendar
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read Third Time in Full – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – MonksTitle apvd – to Senate
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2018: lower Vote
- Yeas: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2018: upper Vote
- Yeas: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor