+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read in full as required – ADOPTED - 42-25-3
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Vote
March 7, 2022: House Vote
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 3
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Yea
- Judy Boyle: Yea
- Lance Clow: Yea
- Brent J. Crane: Yea
- John Gannon: Nay
- Terry Gestrin: Yea
- Marc Gibbs: Nay
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Nay
- Ron Mendive: Yea
- Jason A. Monks: Yea
- Mike Moyle: Yea
- John Vander Woude: Yea
- Fred Wood: Nay
- Rick D. Youngblood: Absent
- Greg Chaney: Nay
- Sue Chew: Nay
- Ryan Kerby: Nay
- John McCrostie: Nay
- Ilana Rubel: Nay
- Heather Scott: Yea
- Sage G. Dixon: Yea
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Yea
- Paul Amador: Yea
- Randy Armstrong: Yea
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Yea
- Priscilla Giddings: Yea
- Karey Hanks: Yea
- Mike Kingsley: Yea
- Dustin Manwaring: Nay
- Dorothy Moon: Yea
- Scott Syme: Nay
- Barbara Ehardt: Yea
- Kevin Andrus: Yea
- Steve Berch: Absent
- Chad Christensen: Yea
- Brooke Green: Nay
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Nay
- Laurie Lickley: Nay
- Tammy Nichols: Yea
- Tony Wisniewski: Yea
- Julianne Young: Yea
- Rod Furniss: Nay
- Lauren Necochea: Nay
- Jim Addis: Yea
- Ben Adams: Yea
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Nay
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Nay
- Greg Ferch: Yea
- Codi Galloway: Yea
- Steven C. Harris: Yea
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Nay
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Nay
- Ron Nate: Yea
- Doug Okuniewicz: Yea
- Joe A. Palmer: Yea
- James D. Ruchti: Nay
- Charlie Shepherd: Yea
- Bruce D. Skaug: Yea
- Sally J. Toone: Nay
- Jon O. Weber: Nay
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
- Lori McCann: Nay
- Ned Burns: Nay
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor