+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 1:08 p.m. on April 4, 2013
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read in full - ADOPTED - 34-0-1
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - ADOPTED - 69-0-1
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor