+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:15 a.m. on January 12, 2018
On January 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – WinderTitle apvd – to House
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced; read first time at length
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read in full as required – ADOPTED – voice voteFloor Sponsor – MoyleTitle apvd – to Senate
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Held at Desk
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
: lower Vote
- Yeas: 1
- Present/NV: 1
: upper Vote
- Yeas: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor