+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:23 a.m. on March 24, 2017
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read in full – ADOPTED - 33-0-2AYES – Agenbroad, Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Crabtree, Davis, Den Hartog, Foreman, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nye, Patrick, Rice, Souza, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – Siddoway, StennettFloor Sponsor - LakeyTitle apvd - to House
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Retained on calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – ADOPTED - 59-8-3AYES – Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Armstrong, Barbieri, Bell, Blanksma, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew(Gill), Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, Dixon, Erpelding(Gugino), Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Giddings, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Manwaring, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moon, Moyle, Packer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Smith, Stevenson, Syme, Thompson, Toone, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, ZollingerNAYS – DeMordaunt, Hanks, Harris, Kingsley(Lohman), Nate, Palmer, Scott, ZitoAbsent – Malek, Shepherd, Mr. SpeakerFloor Sponsor - WoodTitle apvd - to Senate
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH
Type:
Primary Sponsor