+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:48 a.m. on March 19, 2015
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to House
- Read in full - ADOPTED - voice vote
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Read Third Time in Full - ADOPTED - 41-24-5
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
AGRICULTURAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor