+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 74 Effective: 07/01/2017
- Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 17, 2017
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 33-0-2AYES – Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Crabtree, Den Hartog, Foreman, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nye, Patrick, Rice, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – Agenbroad, DavisFloor Sponsor - HarrisTitle apvd - to House
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 69-0-1AYES – Amador, Anderson, Anderst, Armstrong, Barbieri, Bell, Blanksma, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Giddings, Hanks, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kingsley, Kloc(Tway), Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Manwaring, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moon, Moyle, Nate, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Scott, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Syme, Thompson, Toone, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Zito, Zollinger, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – NoneAbsent – Vander WoudeFloor Sponsor - BlanksmaTitle apvd - to Senate
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 13, 2017
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor