+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- 07/01/2017 Section 2
- Effective: 07/01/2015 Section 1;
- Session Law Chapter 40
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2015
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on March 6, 2015
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 34-0-0
- [District 17 seat temporarily vacant]
- Title apvd - to House
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 66-1-3
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
REVENUE AND TAXATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor