+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 16, 2018
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2018 Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 07/01/2018
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Education
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2018: lower Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 33
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2018: lower Vote
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 67
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
EDUCATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor