+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2022 Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 03/07/2022
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on March 4, 2022
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 32-1-2
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 51-17-2
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 21, 2022
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2022: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Grant Burgoyne: Yea
- Janie Ward-Engelking: Yea
- Jim Guthrie: Yea
- Lee Heider: Yea
- Todd M. Lakey: Yea
- Patti Anne Lodge: Yea
- Fred S. Martin: Yea
- Jim Rice: Yea
- Michelle Stennett: Yea
- Steven P. Thayn: Absent
- Steve Vick: Absent
- Chuck Winder: Yea
- Mark Nye: Yea
- Melissa Wintrow: Yea
- Lori Den Hartog: Yea
- Abby Lee: Yea
- Mary Souza: Yea
- Van T. Burtenshaw: Yea
- Mark Harris: Yea
- Jeff Agenbroad: Yea
- Kelly Arthur Anthon: Yea
- Carl Crabtree: Yea
- Jim L. Patrick: Yea
- Christy Zito: Nay
- C. Scott Grow: Yea
- Doug Ricks: Yea
- Dave Lent: Yea
- David Nelson: Yea
- Jim Woodward: Yea
- Regina M. Bayer: Yea
- Kevin Cook: Yea
- Peter Riggs: Yea
- Carrie Semmelroth: Yea
February 21, 2022: House Vote
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Vito Barbieri: Nay
- Judy Boyle: Nay
- Lance Clow: Yea
- Brent J. Crane: Yea
- John Gannon: Yea
- Terry Gestrin: Yea
- Marc Gibbs: Absent
- James Holtzclaw: Yea
- Wendy Horman: Yea
- Clark Kauffman: Yea
- Ron Mendive: Nay
- Jason A. Monks: Yea
- Mike Moyle: Yea
- John Vander Woude: Yea
- Fred Wood: Yea
- Rick D. Youngblood: Yea
- Greg Chaney: Yea
- Sue Chew: Yea
- Ryan Kerby: Yea
- John McCrostie: Yea
- Ilana Rubel: Yea
- Heather Scott: Nay
- Sage G. Dixon: Nay
- Caroline Nilsson Troy: Absent
- Paul Amador: Yea
- Randy Armstrong: Yea
- Megan Blanksma: Yea
- Gayann DeMordaunt: Yea
- Priscilla Giddings: Nay
- Karey Hanks: Nay
- Mike Kingsley: Nay
- Dustin Manwaring: Yea
- Dorothy Moon: Nay
- Scott Syme: Yea
- Barbara Ehardt: Nay
- Kevin Andrus: Yea
- Steve Berch: Yea
- Chad Christensen: Nay
- Brooke Green: Yea
- Linda Wright Hartgen: Yea
- Laurie Lickley: Yea
- Tammy Nichols: Nay
- Tony Wisniewski: Nay
- Julianne Young: Yea
- Rod Furniss: Yea
- Lauren Necochea: Yea
- Jim Addis: Yea
- Ben Adams: Yea
- Matthew “Matt” Bundy: Yea
- David M. Cannon: Yea
- Marco Erickson: Yea
- Greg Ferch: Nay
- Steven C. Harris: Nay
- Gary L. Marshall: Yea
- Chris Mathias: Yea
- Brandon Mitchell: Yea
- Colin Nash: Yea
- Ron Nate: Nay
- Doug Okuniewicz: Nay
- Joe A. Palmer: Yea
- James D. Ruchti: Yea
- Charlie Shepherd: Yea
- Bruce D. Skaug: Yea
- Sally J. Toone: Yea
- Jon O. Weber: Yea
- Julie Yamamoto: Yea
- Lori McCann: Yea
- Ned Burns: Yea
+ − Sponsor
APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor