+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee and referred to: Resources & Environment
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Business
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Vote
March 5, 2018: lower Vote
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 69
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
WAYS
Type:
Primary Sponsor