+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Effective: 07/01/2015
- Session Law Chapter 139
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:17 a.m. on March 23, 2015
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 34-0-1
- Title apvd - to House
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Title apvd - to Senate
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 69-1-0
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY, RULES, AND ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor