+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020 Session Law Chapter 338 Effective: 07/01/2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 8:19 p.m. on March 18, 2020
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by President; returned to House
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
- Title apvd - to House
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 27-6-2
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read in full as required – PASSED - 42-27-1
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 33
- Absent: 2
March 10, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 69
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor