+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2014
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
- Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 24, 2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote - Read in full as required) - PASSED - 33-0-2
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
- Signed by President; returned to House
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 68 Nays 2 Abs/Excd 0, read three times - PASSED - 58-12-0
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor