+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2016 Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 03/28/2016 - Section 6; 07/01/2020 - Section 4; 07/01/2016 - All other sections
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:36 p.m. on March 24, 2016
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 34-0-1AYES – Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – ThaynFloor Sponsor - MortimerTitle apvd - to House
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 64-4-2AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan(Memmott), Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – McMillan, Nate, Scott, SimsAbsent – Bell, ShepherdFloor Sponsor - DeMordauntTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Education
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
EDUCATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor