+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Law without signature – April 8, 2016 Session Law Chapter 377 Effective: 07/01/2016
- Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 28, 2016
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times – PASSED - 67-0-3AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – NoneAbsent – Bateman, Kloc, RubelFloor Sponsor - ChaneyTitle apvd - to enrol
- Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
- Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
- House Concurred in Senate Amendments
- Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time as amended in the Senate – PASSED - 35-0-0AYES – Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – NoneFloor Sponsor - LeeTitle apvd - to House
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
- Amendments reported printed
- Reported out as amended; filed for first reading
- Amendments ordered printed
- Placed in the Committee of the Whole
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 70-0-0AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek(Chadderdon), McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – NoneFloor Sponsor - ChaneyTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing