+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 254 Effective: 01/01/2019
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 22, 2018
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Retained on calendar
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2018: lower Vote
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 33
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2018: lower Vote
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 69
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor