+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2020 Session Law Chapter 173 Effective: 07/01/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 16, 2020
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 31-0-4
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Retained on calendar
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 42-26-2
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 31
- Absent: 4
February 27, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 68
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor