+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Tuesday, March 10, 2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Friday, March 6, 2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
REVENUE
Type:
Primary Sponsor