+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 21, 2013
- Delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on March 20, 2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full - PASSED - 34-0-1
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 67-0-3
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor