+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 113 Effective: 07/01/2018 SECTION 1; When the Idaho Transportation Department submits to the Secretary of State in writing that ITD’s information; technology system has been updated to support the Organ Donation Contribution fund - SECTION 2
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:20 a.m. on March 13, 2018
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2018: lower Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 35
February 26, 2018: lower Vote
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 67
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
TRANSPORTATION
Type:
Primary Sponsor