+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2016 Session Law Chapter 194 Effective: 07/01/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:56 a.m. on March 21, 2016
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 35-0-0AYES – Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – NoneAbsent and excused – NoneFloor Sponsor - BayerTitle apvd - to House
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 69-0-1AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – NoneAbsent – RomrellFloor Sponsor - BoyleTitle apvd - to Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor