+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full - PASSED - 57-11-2
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY, RULES, AND ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor