+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2016 Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:56 a.m. on March 21, 2016
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Suspended: Ayes 66 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 4, read three times – PASSED - 60-7-3AYES – Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Erpelding, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Cheatham, Dixon, McMillan, Nate, Nielsen, Scott, SimsAbsent – Gannon, Gestrin, ShepherdFloor Sponsor - KlocTitle apvd - to enrol
- Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
- Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
- Reported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Education for concurrence recommendation
- Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time as amended in the Senate – PASSED - 30-4-1AYES – Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Patrick, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, WinderNAYS – Anthon, Den Hartog, Nuxoll, RiceAbsent and excused – DavisFloor Sponsor - Ward-EngelkingTitle apvd - to House
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
- Amendments reported printed
- Reported out as amended; filed for first reading
- Amendments ordered printed
- Placed in the Committee of the Whole
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to 14th Order for amendment
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 60-9-1AYES – Anderson(Carter), Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen(Hartgen), Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. SpeakerNAYS – Barbieri, Cheatham, Dixon, McMillan, Nate, Nielsen, Scott, Shepherd, SimsAbsent – VanOrdenFloor Sponsor - KlocTitle apvd - to Senate
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Education
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
EDUCATION COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor