+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2020 Session Law Chapter 112 Effective: 03/11/2020 SECTION 3 & 4; 07/01/2020 SECTION 2; 07/01/2021 SECTION 1
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:10 a.m. on March 9, 2020
- Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by President; returned to House
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Title apvd - to House
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time in full – PASSED - 31-4-0
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time; filed for Third Reading
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
- Received from the House passed; filed for first reading
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title apvd - to Senate
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read Third Time in Full – PASSED - 64-2-4
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time; Filed for Third Reading
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Printed and Referred to Appropriations
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 35
February 20, 2020: lower Vote
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 66
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
APPROPRIATIONS COMMITTEE
Type:
Primary Sponsor